Council Meetings

Upcoming Council Meetings

Friday, September 8, 2017
Thursday, November 30 & Friday, December 1, 2017

Council meetings are open to the public, and are held at the College: 80 College Street, Toronto, ON M5G 2E2‎. If you plan to attend, please contact the Communications Department at cpso@cpso.on.ca or 416-967-2611.

Directions to the College

 

Past Council Meetings

2017

May 25-26, 2017
Council Update

February 24, 2017
Council Update


 

2016

December 1-2, 2016
Council Update

September 8-9, 2016
Council Update

May 30-31, 2016
Council Update

February 26, 2016
Council Update

January 26, 2016
Council Update


 

2015

December 3-4, 2015
Council Update

September 10-11, 2015
Council Update

May 28-29, 2015
Council Update

March 6, 2015
Council Update


 

2014

December 4-5, 2014
Council Update

September 4-5, 2014
Council Update

May 29-30, 2014
Council Update

March 7, 2014
Council Update

 

Directions to CPSO
80 College Street, Toronto, ON

By public transit

  • From the Queen's Park subway station (University-Spadina line): one block east of University Avenue
  • From the College subway station (Yonge line): two blocks west of Yonge Street
  • The Carlton/College streetcar stops in front of the College at Elizabeth Street

Parking

Underground parking is available at College Park, 777 Bay Street. Enter on the east side of Bay Street, south of College.