Processing Times and Meeting Dates

The Registration Committee normally meets once every four to six weeks. Meeting dates for 2017 and corresponding deadlines are shown below.

Applications

All incoming applications must undergo initial assessment by the Applications and Credentials Department. Applications must be assessed and all credentialing documents received by the Applications and Credentials Department before referral to the Registration Committee. The initial assessment on average takes five weeks given that 100 cases are referred to the Registration Committee each month.

Applications that include open and past complaints, legal matters, breaks in practice, supervision, any issues pertaining to section 2 (1) of Ontario Regulation 865/93: Registration, and any questions that are answered with “yes” responses will require additional documentation after the initial assessment to clarify these matters. This will increase the processing time by 5 to 7 weeks at a minimum, depending on the nature of the outstanding requirements. Additional requirements based on individual applications may be requested to facilitate the committee’s decision.

All applicants whose applications require review by the Registration Committee are provided a complete copy of all the documents from their registration file that will be reviewed by the Registration Committee. These copies are provided to the applicant free of charge.

Co-ordinator

The Co-ordinator will ensure that your case is brought forward with sufficient information to make a decision. He or she will produce a legal file on your behalf, including the copying, scanning, collating and pagination of files. The legal file is submitted to the Registration Committee, which is comprised of practising members of the profession. The Registration Committee reviews all cases two weeks prior to the meeting date. Applications that do not fall within the published deadlines (see below) cannot be accommodated.

Meeting dates

Tentative meeting dates corresponding to receipt of your application will be indicated by your co-ordinator and posted to your online application status account once the initial assessment is complete. Please do not schedule a practice start date until you receive the outcome of your review – doing so will not speed up the process.

Decision letters

Decision letters are sent electronically and by hard copy within 7 business days after the meeting. Once final documents are received, a quality check requiring three individual reviews is performed and your certificate of registration will be issued closer to your start date.

Every effort is made on the part of the College to meet the deadlines for the corresponding meeting dates. Nevertheless, these deadlines are not binding on the College and there is no guarantee with respect to scheduling a Registration Committee review. Complex applications requiring more staff preparation time, including those where conduct-related issues have been identified, must often be scheduled for a subsequent meeting date. Registration Committee caseload limitations may also force deferral of an application to a subsequent meeting date.

We encourage you to arrange for the submission of requirements in a timely fashion, as the process is dependent on you to facilitate the review of your application.

Interim meetings

Unscheduled interim meetings of the Registration Committee may occasionally occur between regularly scheduled meetings for review of eligible registration policy-based applications. Such meetings are held subject to time of year, overall Registration Committee caseload, and availability of a committee member quorum. Applicants scheduled for review at these meetings will be notified accordingly.

Meeting Dates

2017-18 Credentialing Completion Deadlines

To enable referral to the Registration Committee, all credentialing and supporting documents must be received and assessed by these dates. Should you miss a confirmed deadline, you will be working with the next meeting date deadlines.

Application
received by*:
Final documents
assessed by:
 Meeting Date
October 26, 2017 December 14, 2017 January 25, 2018
December 1, 2017 January 31, 2018 March 7, 2018
January 17, 2018 March 15, 2018 April 19, 2018
February 20, 2018 April 12, 2018 May 17, 2018
March 21, 2018 May 10, 2018 June 14, 2018
May 9, 2018 June 27, 2018 August 2, 2018
June 19, 2018 August 9, 2018 September 13, 2018
July 27, 2018 September 12, 2018 October 17, 2018
August 23, 2018 October 11, 2018 November 15, 2018
September 20, 2018 November 8, 2018 December 13, 2018

*Your application fee must be processed by the College’s Finance Department by the above-mentioned date. No initial assessment of your application will be completed until your application fee has been processed.

Decision letters are sent electronically within 7 business days after the meeting. Once final documents are received, a quality check requiring three individual reviews is performed and your certificate of registration is issued within five business days.

Table of Contents