First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Aug 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Jul 2013 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 30 Jun 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Oct 2015 |