Gharajeh, Arash (CPSO#: 88605)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: (905) 883-1212
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

201 Georgian Dr
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Canada
Phone: (705) 728-909
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arash Gharajeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Gharajeh ( CPSO# 88605 )
Dr. M. Radina ( CPSO# 88627 )

Business Address:
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
9401 Jane Street
Maple ON  L6A 4H7

Business Address:
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ARASH GHARAJEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GHARAJEH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 28 Feb 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Mar 2012 to 30 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2013 to 31 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014