Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: May 20, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr Andrzej Wojcicki Tomasz to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective May 20, 2020:
College Investigations were conducted into whether Dr. Wojcicki failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession and was incompetent, and with respect to his compliance with the Out of Hospital Premises Inspection Program. In the face of the Investigations and an unsatisfactory reassessment report received by the College on December 3, 2019, Dr. Wojcicki resigned from the College on March 13, 2020, and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: September 7, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person:
Download Full Document (PDF)
Source:
Member
Active Date: February 19, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Andrzej Tomasz Wojcicki to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 19, 2016:
Allegations of professional misconduct and incompetence regarding Dr. Wojcicki were referred to a discipline hearing by the College. As a result, Dr. Wojcicki must not practise complementary and alternative medicine.
Dr. Wojcicki shall post a clearly visible sign in the waiting rooms of all his primary care Practice Locations, which states as follows: ''Dr. Wojcicki must not practise complementary and alternative medicine. Further information may be found on the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario website at www.cpso.on.ca".