Aal Ali, Saleh Saif Salem A S Fares (CPSO#: 82358)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Oct 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
P O Box: 8313
Abu Dhabi 0000
United Arab Emirates
Phone: +971506117644

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 29 Jul 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SALEH SAIF SALEM A S FARES AAL ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AAL ALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 09 May 2005 to 05 Jun 2005
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 05 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2007