Aamri, Etedal Mohammad Hifzi (CPSO#: 84170)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Oct 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Oct 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 04 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 May 2006 to 12 Jun 2006
PEAP - Resident - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Sep 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 12 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 13 Oct 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 06 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 07 Nov 2009 to 06 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 07 Nov 2010 to 30 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2011 to 30 Sep 2012
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Oct 2013
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2013