Aarabi, Mehdi (CPSO#: 81281)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Mashhad University of Medical Science, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 22 Sep 2004
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2014