Aaron, Shawn David (CPSO#: 62311)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 1991


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa General Hospital
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 74729
Fax: (613) 739-6807
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wolfish Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2008

Dr. S. Aaron ( CPSO# 62311 )
Dr. K. Wolfish ( CPSO# 62475 )
Dr. N. Wolfish ( CPSO# 18469 )

Business Address:
Ottawa General Hospital
1812F - 501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 739-6636

Business Address:
Suite 311
1919 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 1A2
Phone Number: (613) 526-0080

Business Address:
80 Michael Cowpland
Kanata ON  K2M 2G9
Phone Number: (613) 599-3321

Business Address:
Health Services
University of Ottawa
Suite 200
100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 1A2

Business Address:
7th Floor
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa


Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 15 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. SHAWN DAVID AARON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AARON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1991