Aasheim, Lise Holm (CPSO#: 68031)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Danish, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone: (705) 740-6873
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aasheim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Aasheim ( CPSO# 68031 )

Business Address:
26 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C3
Phone Number: (705) 740-6873

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jul 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LISE HOLM AASHEIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AASHEIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 28 Jul 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jul 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2008