Abadi, Babak (CPSO#: 67093)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMH PACE Clinic
Room 1326
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 32722
Fax: (416) 583-1296
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Babak Abadi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Abadi ( CPSO# 67093 )

Business Address:
CAMH PACE Clinic
Room 1326
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BABAK ABADI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABADI is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 1 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 4 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2003