Abadir, Wadid Wassef Khalil (CPSO#: 71496)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1997

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, French

Education:University of Alexandria, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 305
2347 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1T 3T8
Phone: (416) 297-8800
Fax: (416) 297-6502
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Pigmented Lesion Clinic
Odette
Cancer Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wadid Abadir Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Abadir ( CPSO# 71496 )
Dr. S. Azer ( CPSO# 57037 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
2347 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1T 3T8
Phone Number: (416) 297-8800

Business Address:
302 - 2330 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1T 0A2
Phone Number: (416) 298-1303

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WADID WASSEF KHALIL ABADIR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABADIR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2001