Abara, Okechukwu Emmanuel (CPSO#: 50040)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Apr 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 22 Feb 2011

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Ibo

Education:University of Ibadan, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9755 Bathurst Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3X5
Phone: (905) 883-3666
Fax: (905) 883-0080
Electoral District: 05
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 12A
8401 Weston Road
Woodbridge ON  L4L 1A6
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

2 W ooten Way North
Markham ON  L3P 5T7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abara Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 05 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Abara ( CPSO# 50040 )

Business Address:
9755 Bathurst Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3X5
Phone Number: (905) 883-3666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls
Bingham Memorial Hospital Matheson
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Lady Minto Hospital Cochrane
Notre-Dame Hospital Hearst
Sensenbrenner Hospital Kapuskasing
Smooth Rock Falls Hospital Smooth Rock Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 16 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 22 Feb 2011

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
member Effective: 22 Feb 2011 Active View Details [+]
            As  from  February  22, 2011, the following is imposed as a term, condition and
            limitation on the certificate  of  registration  held by Dr. Okechukwu Emmanuel
            Abara, in accordance with an undertaking and consent  given by Dr. Abara to the
            College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                  In  the operating room, Dr. Abara may be the Most  Responsible  Physician
                  only  in  relation  to the procedures set out in his undertaking with the
                  College.  Otherwise, Dr. Abara may assist other surgeons in the Operating
                  Room with any procedure even if not included in the undertaking.