Abbasi, Khawar Mahmood (CPSO#: 87561)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:King Edward Medical College, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khawar Mahmood Abbasi Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Servicess (111 St Regis Crescent South, North York, ON M3J 1Y6, 416-398-0638)
Date Received: 11 Aug 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2016