Abbass, Allan Anthony (CPSO#: 64750)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist
Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jul 1995