Abbass, Syed Akbar (CPSO#: 78223)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Sep 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Sep 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (416) 530-6000
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Syed Akbar Abbass Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 26 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abbass ( CPSO# 78223 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SYED AKBAR ABBASS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABBASS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Sep 2007