Abbey, Susan Elizabeth (CPSO#: 50042)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1981

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto General Hospital
Eaton Wing North
8Th Floor Room 222
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone: (416) 340-4447
Fax: (416) 340-4198
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 03 Jun 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN ELIZABETH ABBEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABBEY is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1981 to 15 Jun 1982
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1983