Abbott, Carter Owen (CPSO#: 52751)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Oct 1998

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 05 Oct 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Oct 1998