Abbott, Edith Vivien (CPSO#: 11674)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 21 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1945

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 13 Nov 1972 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 1945
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Sep 1959
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jan 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Jun 1999