Abbott, Lesleigh Selina (CPSO#: 92268)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 2370
Fax: (613) 738-4828
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lesleigh S. Abbott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Abbott ( CPSO# 92268 )

Business Address:
Childrens Hospital of Eastern Ontario
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Paediatric Haematology/Oncology Effective: 23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LESLEIGH SELINA ABBOTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABBOTT is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 23 Nov 2009 to 18 Dec 2009
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Haematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Haematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2013