Abboud, Jeffrey (CPSO#: 58959)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 306
770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone: (613) 321-8328
Fax: (613) 728-3942
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jeffrey Abboud Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 08 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Abboud ( CPSO# 58959 )

Business Address:
306 - 770 Broadview Avenue
Ottawa ON  K2A 3Z3
Phone Number: (613) 321-8328

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 09 Aug 2011 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY ABBOUD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABBOUD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Sep 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jul 1988