Abd-El-Malek, Medhat Zikry (CPSO#: 63011)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2011


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Asyut University, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abd-El-Malek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 10 2008


Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1994
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 1994
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2011