Abdalla, Judith Anne (CPSO#: 57488)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1986

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Nov 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:University of Montreal, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 22 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDITH ANNE ABDALLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDALLA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1986
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 1988