Abdallah, Omar Elfarouk Mohammed (CPSO#: 50043)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Sep 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Walkerville Medical Centre
Suite 110
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone: (519) 252-9196
Fax: (519) 252-0375
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Omar E.M. Abdallah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. O. Abdallah ( CPSO# 50043 )

Business Address:
North Walkerville Medical Centre
Suite 110
2425 Tecumseh Road East
Windsor ON  N8W 1E6
Phone Number: (519) 252-9196

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 10 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. OMAR ELFAROUK MOHAMMED ABDALLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDALLAH is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Sep 1982
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 1999