Abdeen, Aboosaly Zainul (CPSO#: 45628)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese, Tamil

Education:University of Colombo, 1961

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Western Health Services Tel: 519 661 3380
Date Received: 08 Jun 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 20 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Aug 1977 to 30 Jun 1978
Resident 4 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 1977
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Aug 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2000
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Jun 2015