Abdeen, Nishard Mohammed (CPSO#: 62162)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 May 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 May 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dutch, English, French, Spanish

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CHEO
Dept of radiology
401 Smythe Road
Ottawa, Ontario
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Ext. 3355
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nishard Abdeen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 02 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abdeen ( CPSO# 62162 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Radiology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NISHARD MOHAMMED ABDEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 1990