Abdel Aziz, Hani Ahmad Abdalla (CPSO#: 74396)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 02 Nov 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Nov 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 1999 to 30 Sep 2000
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Sep 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Oct 2001 to 02 Nov 2001
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Nov 2001