Abdel Malak, Nagy Malak (CPSO#: 76345)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Asyut University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North Hamilton Community
Health Centre
438 Hughson Street North
Hamilton ON  L8L 4N5
Phone: (905) 523-6611 Ext. 2033
Fax: (905) 523-8735
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Derry Medical Clinic
Unit 16B
3221 Derry Road West
Mississauga ON  L5N 7L7
Canada
Phone: (905) 824-0005
Fax: (905) 824-7440
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abdel Malak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Abdel Malak ( CPSO# 76345 )

Business Address:
Derry Medical Centre
Unit 16B
3221 Derry Road West
Mississauga ON  L5N 7L7
Phone Number: (905) 824-0005

Business Address:
363 Colborne Street
Brantford ON  N3S 3N2
Phone Number: (519) 754-0777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAGY MALAK ABDEL MALAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL MALAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2003