Abdel Malek, Wafik France (CPSO#: 81822)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jan 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alexandria, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
308 Guelph street
Georgetown ON  L7G 4B1
Phone: (905) 877-2220
Fax: (905) 877-5554
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Wafik F. Abdel Malek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Abdel Malek ( CPSO# 81822 )

Business Address:
308 Guleph Street
Georgetown ON  L7G 4B1
Phone Number: (905) 877-2220

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jan 2007 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WAFIK FRANCE ABDEL MALEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL MALEK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2004 to 10 Nov 2004
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Nov 2004 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Jan 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jan 2007