Abdel Salam, Suzan Yousef (CPSO#: 83360)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LMC Endocrinology Centres
Suite 110
370 Bayview drive
Barrie ON  L4N 3L7
Phone: (705) 737-0830
Fax: (705) 737-0679
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Suzan Abdel Salam Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abdel Salam ( CPSO# 83360 )

Business Address:
110 - 370 Bayview Drive
Barrie ON  L4N 3L7
Phone Number: (705) 737-0830

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUZAN YOUSEF ABDEL SALAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL SALAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 22 Sep 2005
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2005
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007