Abdel-Malak, Maher Naguib Mehany (CPSO#: 84942)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Langley Memorial Hospital
22051 Fraser Hwy
Langley BC  V3A4H4
Phone: (604) 514-6000
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Maher Abdel-Malak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 16 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abdel-Malak ( CPSO# 84942 )

Business Address:
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAHER NAGUIB MEHANY ABDEL-MALAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL-MALAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 21 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 22 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2008