Abdel-Malek, Maximous Youssef Meikael (CPSO#: 75282)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2000

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Asyut University, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lisgar Woods Medical Centre
Unit B 2
6970 Lisgar Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 8C8
Phone: (905) 824-4441
Fax: (905) 824-4431
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Maximous Abdel-Malek Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 19 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abdel-Malek ( CPSO# 75282 )

Business Address:
Lisgar Woods Medical Centre
B2 - 6970 Lisgar Drive
Mississauga ON  L5N 8C8
Phone Number: (905) 824-4441

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MAXIMOUS YOUSSEF MEIKAEL ABDEL-MALEK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL-MALEK is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2000

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Jan 2010
Summary:

 On January 21, 2010, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. AbdelMalek committed an act of 
 professional misconduct, in that he engaged in an act or omission relevant to the practice of 
 medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as 
 unprofessional.

Between 1978 and 1994, Dr. AbdelMalek was a general practitioner and general 
 surgeon in Egpyt. He did a locum in Saudi Arabia between February and September 1994. In 1994, Dr. 
 AbdelMalek immigrated to Canada. Between his arrival in Canada in 1994 and 1998, Dr. AbdelMalek 
 had various occupations and engaged in various medical educational pursuits. He did not practise 
 medicine during this time. In 2000, Dr. AbdelMalek applied to the CPSO for a Certificate of 
 Registration, and was registered to carry on independent practice in June 2000. Dr. AbdelMalek 
 admits that the information he supplied to the CPSO on his applications was not accurate, in that 
 it overstated the duration of his practice in Egypt, failed to disclose interruptions in practice 
 after he came to Canada in 1994, and did not disclose his period of practice in Saudi Arabia.

The 
 Discipline Committee ordered and directed that:

1.	Dr. AbdelMalek successfully complete, at his 
 own expense, the College's Medical Ethics and Informed Consent Course on the next available date, 
 and in any event within six months of the date of the Order, and provide proof thereof to the 
 College.

2.	Dr. AbdelMalek appear before the panel to be reprimanded.

3.	Dr. AbdelMalek pay to 
 the College costs in the amount of $3,650 within 30 days of the date of the Order.

4.	The results 
 of this proceeding be included in the register.

Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): January 21, 2010

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: February 15, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the
disposition includes a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)