Abdel-Shahid, Raafat Barsoum (CPSO#: 29368)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 04 Dec 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 04 Dec 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1960

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: 3845 Borrelli Drive Windsor ON N9G 2H7 Tel: 519-972-1050 Fax: 519-972-1050
Date Received: 19 Jan 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 29 Mar 1976 RCPSC Specialist
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Dec 2014