Abdelbary, Hesham Abdel Motey M (CPSO#: 79341)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Surgery
Orthopaedics
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Department of Orthopaedic Surgery
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8899
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hesham Abdelbary Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 31 2015


Corporation Name: Hesham Abdelbary Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 27 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Aboutouk ( CPSO# 95940 )
Dr. H. Abdelbary ( CPSO# 79341 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Surgery Orthopaedics
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (647) 893-3176

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HESHAM ABDEL MOTEY M ABDELBARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDELBARY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2010