Abdelgadir, Dalal Yosif Ahmed (CPSO#: 87200)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 08 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Khartoum, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Royal Alexandra Hospital, Northern Alberta Neonatal Program, DTC 5027, 10240 Kingsway Avenue, Edmonton, AB, T5H 3V9
Date Received: 08 Aug 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 31 Dec 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Dec 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Nov 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2016