Abdelhalim, Vanessa (CPSO#: 95806)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Greenbelt Family Health Team
3500 Fallowfield Rd, Unit 1C
Nepean ON  K2J 4A7
Phone: (613) 843-1718
Fax: (613) 843-0201
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Carleton University Health
and Counselling Services
1125 Colonel By Dr
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Canada
Phone: 613-520-6674
Fax: 613-520-4059
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Ottawa Medispa Orleans
2211 St. Joseph Blvd.
Orleans ON  K1C 7C5
Canada
Phone: 6138340333
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Bank Street Ottawa Medispa
1379 Bank St
Ottawa ON  K1H 8N3
Canada
Phone: 6137335500
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. V. Abdelhalim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 23 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Abdelhalim ( CPSO# 95806 )

Business Address:
2211 St Joseph Boulevard
Ottawa ON  K1C 7C5
Phone Number: (613) 834-0333

Business Address:
1379 Bank Street
Ottawa ON  K1H 8N3
Phone Number: (613) 733-5500

Business Address:
Greenbelt Family Health Team
Unit 1C
3500 Fallowfield Road
Nepean ON  K2J 4A7
Phone Number: (613) 843-1718

Business Address:
1125 Colonel By Drive
2600 CTTC Building
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Phone Number: (613) 520-6674

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VANESSA ABDELHALIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDELHALIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013