Abdelshaheed, Rami (CPSO#: 90937)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 420
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone: (905) 842-3366
Fax: (905) 842-1180
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rami Abdelshaheed Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Abdelshaheed ( CPSO# 90937 )

Business Address:
Suite 420
2525 Old Bronte Road
Oakville ON  L6M 4J2
Phone Number: (905) 842-3336

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 22 Oct 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMI ABDELSHAHEED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDELSHAHEED is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2013