Abdool, Petal Shaheba (CPSO#: 87674)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of The West Indies,Trinidad, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
C A M H
Geriatric Psychiatry Division
80 Workman Way
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501 Ext. 39404
Fax: 416-583-1293
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

3276 St Clair Ave E
Providence Healthcare
Toronto ON  M1L 1W1
Canada
Phone: (416) 285-3665
Fax: 4162853663
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Providence Health Care,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETAL SHAHEBA ABDOOL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDOOL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 10 Sep 2007 to 24 Sep 2007
PEAP - Resident - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 25 Sep 2007 to 29 Feb 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 10 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013