Abdul Rasoul, Majedah Mohammed (CPSO#: 67684)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 03 Nov 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 07 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 10 Mar 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 31 Dec 1995
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
Resident 4 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Endocrinology and Metabolism

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999