Abdul Razak, Albiruni Ryan (CPSO#: 91964)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2020

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jul 2013

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malay

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Division of Medical Oncology
Drug Development Program
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 586-5371
Electoral District: 10
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Medical Oncology
Suite 12-23, 600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X9
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-5371
Fax: (416) 586-5615
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. R. Abdul Razak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abdul Razak ( CPSO# 91964 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Division of Medical Oncology
Drug Development Program
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 586-5371

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Medical Oncology
600 University Avenue
Room 12-23
Toronto ON  M5G 1X9
Phone Number: (416) 586-5371

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective: 01 Jul 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 16 Oct 2009
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 17 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 Apr 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jul 2016 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Albiruni Ryan Abdul Razak may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division of Medical Oncology at the University of Toronto, in which
                        Dr.  Abdul  Razak  holds  an  academic  appointment  at the rank of
                        Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires seven  years  from
                  the date  of  issuance  or  when  Dr.  Abdul  Razak   no longer holds the
                  academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon  the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  College  receives  a  report indicating that Dr. Abdul Razak's
                        clinical  performance,  knowledge,  skill,  judgment,  professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive  an  annual  report  or  receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when  the  Committee  makes  a  decision  about  Dr.  Abdul Razak's
                        certificate   of  registration,  following  consideration  of   the
                        practice assessment report. 
                  
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  July  1,  2013.   In  accordance  with
                  paragraphs 2 and 3 above,  this  certificate will, if not extended by the
                  Registration Committee, automatically expire on June 30, 2020.