Abdul-Rahman, Ibrahim (CPSO#: 81736)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Feb 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Feb 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:UNIVERSITY OF BASRA, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Oshawa Medical Centre
675 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1G4
Phone: (905) 448-9443
Fax: (905) 448-1942
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I. Abdul-Rahman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. I. Abdul-Rahman ( CPSO# 81736 )

Business Address:
Oshawa Medical Centre
675 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1G4
Phone Number: (905) 448-9443

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IBRAHIM ABDUL-RAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDUL-RAHMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2004
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 25 Jul 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Feb 2005