Abdul-Razzak, Amane (CPSO#: 87925)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 12 Jan 2008
Elective Trainee - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jan 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013