Abdulaziz, Hani Ali Malallah (CPSO#: 74104)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 25 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 26 Aug 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 16 Dec 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2002 to 16 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2003 to 16 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 17 Dec 2004 to 30 Sep 2005
Clinical Fellow - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2005