Abdulhak, Mohammad Muwaffak (CPSO#: 69674)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Aleppo, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 08 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 02 Oct 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Oct 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 02 Oct 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Oct 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 02 Oct 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 03 Oct 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Nov 2005
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2010