Abduljalil, Nabil (CPSO#: 91836)

Current Status: Active Member as of 10 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
College & Ossington Family Practice
815 College Street
Toronto ON  M6G 1C9
Phone: (416) 533-1145
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective: 31 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 19 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NABIL ABDULJALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULJALIL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 10 Jul 2009 to 01 Oct 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 02 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 01 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 02 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
Clinical Fellow - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2009