Abdulla, Ramzan Hussein (CPSO#: 28056)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Aug 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 1995

Summary

Former Name: Abdullah, Ramzan Hussein (used until: 09 Jan 1983 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Makerere Univ, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1821 Rose Street
Regina SK  S4P 1Z7
Phone: (306) 525-2270
Fax: (306) 359-1068

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 1980 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective: 26 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMZAN HUSSEIN ABDULLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULLA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Aug 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1995