Abdulla, Sonya Julie (CPSO#: 88755)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Dermatology on Bloor
29 Park Road
Toronto ON  M4W 2N2
Phone: 416-922-9620
Fax: 416-922-4358
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sonya Abdulla Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Abdulla ( CPSO# 88755 )

Business Address:
Dermatology on Bloor
208 Bloor Street West
Suite 403
Toronto ON  M5S 3B4
Phone Number: (416) 922-9620

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SONYA JULIE ABDULLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULLA is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013