Abdullah, Mustafa Hassan Mohammad (CPSO#: 65919)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kuwait University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Sep 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 May 1993
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jun 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 May 1994
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jun 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 31 May 1995
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jun 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 15 Sep 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Aug 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000