Abdulrahman, Abdulqadir Mohamed (CPSO#: 85080)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Somalia, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria
Regional Health Centre
Department of Anesthesia
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9090 Ext. 46550
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Abdulrahman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 05 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abdulrahman ( CPSO# 85080 )

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9090

Business Address:
580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax ON  L1S 2J4
Phone Number: (905) 683-2320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ABDULQADIR MOHAMED ABDULRAHMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULRAHMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011