Abdulrahman, Emad Abdulsatar (CPSO#: 91201)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - General Pathology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Pathology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013